EP0854295 - Sterilisation apparatus using ozone for raising water-zone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.04.2004 [2004/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Marine Techno Research, Inc. 22, Furumachi Nagasaki-shi Nagasaki-ken 850-0026 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/19] | For all designated states Marine Techno Research, Inc. 22, Furumachi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken 850-0026 / JP | ||
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states Marine techno Research, Inc. 22, Furumachi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshinaga, Katsutoshi c/o Marine Techno Research Inc., 22, Furumachi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | 02 /
Kasai, Hironao c/o Marine Techno Research Inc., 22, Furumachi Nagasaki-shi, Nagasaki-ken / JP | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel Möhlstrasse 37 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115632.8 | 09.09.1997 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | JP19970023311 | 21.01.1997 Original published format: JP 2331197 | [1998/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0854295 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854295 | Date: | 07.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F04F5/04, F04F5/24, A01K63/04, C02F1/78, B01F3/04 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
F04F5/04 (EP);
A01K63/042 (EP);
B01F23/237613 (EP);
B01F23/454 (EP);
B01F25/211 (EP);
B01F25/314 (EP);
B01F25/3142 (EP);
B01F25/31423 (EP);
B01F25/31432 (EP);
C02F1/78 (EP);
C02F7/00 (EP);
F04F5/24 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, GB [1999/14] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Sterilisation von Aufzuchtsgewässern mit Ozon | [1998/30] | English: | Sterilisation apparatus using ozone for raising water-zone | [1998/30] | French: | Dispositif pour la stérilisation des zones d'élévage aquatiques à l'aide d'ozone | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 06.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 05.12.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]JPH05340400 ; | [A]JPH08200300 ; | [A]JPH05293479 ; | [A]US4019983 (MANDT MIKKEL G) [A] 4 * abstract * * column 4 * * column 11 *; | [Y]US5403522 (VON BERG RICHARD [US]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * column 2 - column 3; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5514267 (MACHIYA KATSUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 5* column 13, line 13 - column 15, line 17; figures 13,16 *; | [A]US5525242 (KERECZ ROBERT C J [US]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 63 - column 5, line 42; figure 2 * | [YA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940329), vol. 018, no. 183, Database accession no. (M - 1584), & JP05340400 A 19931221 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD;OTHERS: 01) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3,4 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19961226), vol. 096, no. 012, & JP08200300 A 19960806 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1-4 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940216), vol. 018, no. 093, Database accession no. (C - 1166), & JP05293479 A 19931109 (HITACHI KIDEN KOGYO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |