EP0828384 - Controlling the movable lens of an image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Senda, Akira Canon Kabushiki Kaisha, 30-2, Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1998/11] | Representative(s) | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Weser & Kollegen Patentanwälte Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/11] | Weser, Wolfgang, et al Dres. Weser & Martin, Patentanwälte, Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115645.0 | 09.09.1997 | [1998/11] | Priority number, date | JP19960260214 | 09.09.1996 Original published format: JP 26021496 | [1998/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0828384 | Date: | 11.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0828384 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0828384 | Date: | 14.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/232 | [1998/11] | CPC: |
H04N23/67 (EP,US);
H04N23/633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2000/26] |
Former [1998/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Steuerung der beweglichen Linse einer Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | [1998/15] | English: | Controlling the movable lens of an image pickup apparatus | [1998/11] | French: | Commande d'une lentille mobile dans un dispositif de prise de vue | [1998/11] |
Former [1998/11] | Kontrolle der beweglichen Linse einer Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | Examination procedure | 12.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/23] | 28.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.07.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 23.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.01.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 13.01.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 09.09.2004 | [2006/13] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4404595 (USHIRO TATSUZO [JP], et al) [Y] 8 * column 3, line 14 - column 7, line 61 *; | [A]EP0405051 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1-8* page 10, line 13 - line 46 *; | [A]EP0439219 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 3 - column 10, line 3 *; | [XY]US5227829 (IMANARI HITOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,7 * column 5, line 22 - column 12, line 24 * [Y] 8 |