EP0832551 - Feeding assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deere & Company One John Deere Place Moline, IL 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY One John Deere Place Moline, Illinois 61265-8098 / US | ||
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY John Deere Road Moline Illinois 61265-8098 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Augie, Patrick 225 Gara Street Ottumwa, Iowa 52501 / US | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al John Deere GmbH & Co. KG Global Intellectual Property Services John-Deere-Strasse 70 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Magin, Ludwig Bernhard, et al Deere & Company European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | ||
Former [1998/14] | Feldmann, Bernhard, et al DEERE & COMPANY European Office Patent Department 68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115705.2 | 10.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | US19960722597 | 27.09.1996 Original published format: US 722597 | [1998/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832551 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832551 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832551 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01D75/18 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
A01D75/187 (EP,US);
Y10S56/15 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB [1999/08] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Einzugszusammenbau | [1998/14] | English: | Feeding assembly | [1998/14] | French: | Ensemble d'alimentation | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 08.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.01.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 27.04.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Appeal following examination | 25.01.2001 | Appeal received | 25.01.2001 | Statement of grounds filed | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2024590 (DEERE & CO); | [DA]US4193248 (GILLEMAN JOSEPH T G [BE]); | [A]DE3019166 (CLAAS OHG [DE]); | [A]GB2103762 (SPERRY CORP [US]) [A] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US4433528 (BOHMAN CARL E [US]); | [A]EP0666021 (FORD NEW HOLLAND NV [BE]) |