EP0832736 - Process for the realisation of a wooden stratified panel of the reinforced type and panel thus obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caporello, Mario Via Girolamo Rorario 21 33170 Pordenone / IT | For all designated states Buoro, Roberto Via Cesare Battisti 15 31015 Conegliano (TV) / IT | [1998/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2003/15] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/14] | D'Agostini, Giovanni, Dr. D'AGOSTINI ORGANIZZAZIONE Via G. Giusti 17 33100 Udine / IT | Application number, filing date | 97115776.3 | 11.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | IT1996TV00113 | 13.09.1996 Original published format: IT TV960113 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0832736 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0832736 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | [1999/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832736 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B32B21/10, B27M3/00, B27D1/04 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
B32B21/10 (EP,US);
B27M3/0053 (EP);
B32B3/14 (US);
B32B38/0004 (US);
B32B7/12 (US);
E04C2/14 (EP);
B32B2315/085 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/03] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | 17.09.1997 | LT | 17.09.1997 | LV | 17.09.1997 | RO | 17.09.1997 | SI | 17.09.1997 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von verstärkten Holzverbundplatten und eine dadurch erhaltene Platte | [1998/14] | English: | Process for the realisation of a wooden stratified panel of the reinforced type and panel thus obtained | [1998/14] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de panneaux stratifiés en bois de type renforcé et panneaux ainsi produits | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 26.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS5258777 ; | [X]FR2096943 (ROUGIER & FILS SA) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]GB2050941 (SCIA SOC COMPENSATI IMPIALLACC) [X] 1,6 * page 1, line 6 - line 7 * * page 1, line 61 - line 66 * * page 1, line 9 - line 96 * * page 1, line 102 - line 107 * * page 1, line 112 - line 123; figure .; claims 1-3 * [Y] 2-5; | [A]US4271649 (BELANGER GERMAIN); | [A]FR2588507 (DEUDON FREDERIC [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US4931124 (BAUM CHARLES S [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2690221 (GOR APPLIC SPECIALI SRL [IT], et al); | [Y]DE4325273 (GRUBER & WEBER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [Y] 4 * figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]FR2725149 (PROFICHET RICHARD NICOLAS JEAN [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5725929 (COOKE LESLIE [US], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 77, no. 25, Database accession no. 77-44585Y, XP002091986 & JPS5258777 A 19770514 (JANOME SEIKI KK) [Y] 2-5 * abstract * |