EP0844704 - Manufacturing method of twisted ready-made lines and device for carrying out the method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2000 [2000/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baumann GmbH Max-Planck-Strasse 1 92224 Amberg / DE | [1998/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kredler, Gerhard Dr.-Reichenberger-Strasse 23 92249 Vilseck / DE | 02 /
Konrad, Josef Am Kirchplatz 9 92694 Etzenricht / DE | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Graf, Helmut, et al Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Graf, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing., et al Postfach 10 08 26 93008 Regensburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115875.3 | 12.09.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | DE1996147895 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19647895 | DE1996149759 | 30.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19649759 | DE1997135655 | 16.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19735655 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844704 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844704 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/28, H01B13/02 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
H01B13/0207 (EP,US);
H01R43/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | H01R43/28 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/16] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen von verdrillten, konfektionierten leitungen sowie Vorrichtung zum Durchführen des Verfahrens | [1998/22] | English: | Manufacturing method of twisted ready-made lines and device for carrying out the method | [1998/22] | French: | Méthode de fabrication de lignes torsadées confectionnées ainsi que dispositif de mise en oeuvre de la méthode | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/42] | 24.05.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 17.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 17.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 17.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US3957092 (LOY FRED W, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 3, line 23 - column 19, line 61; figures 1-22 * [A] 5,6,10-12; | [XA]US4132250 (BROWN WILLIAM T, et al) [X] 1,4 * column 2, line 13 - column 6, line 63; figures 1-11 * [A] 5,6,10-12; | [E]DE19631770 (GLUTH SYSTEMTECHNIK GMBH [DE], et al) [E] 1-3* column 4, line 61 - column 7, line 50; figures 1-7 * |