EP0829798 - Image-based touchscreen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard, Massachusetts 01754 / US | [1998/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Waters, Keith 11 Eden Avenue West Newton, Massachusetts 02165-1905 / US | [1998/12] | Representative(s) | Charig, Raymond Julian Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/41] | Charig, Raymond Julian Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [1998/12] | Betten & Resch Reichenbachstrasse 19 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97115924.9 | 12.09.1997 | [1998/12] | Priority number, date | US19960712970 | 12.09.1996 Original published format: US 712970 | [1998/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0829798 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/12] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0829798 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/00, G06K11/08 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0428 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/12] | G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/09] |
Former [1998/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildunterstützter berührungsempfindlicher Bildschirm | [1998/12] | English: | Image-based touchscreen | [1998/12] | French: | Ecran tactile utilisant des images pour détecter la position | [1998/12] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/47] | 08.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/50] | 20.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/50] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0535988 (SIGMAX KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,9 * the whole document * [Y] 3,4; | [Y]EP0718748 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6,9 * column 4, line 1 - column 5, line 21 * * column 9, line 39 - line 58 *; | [Y]EP0613079 (ZELTRON SPA [IT]) [Y] 1,2,4,6,9 * column 3, line 14 - line 22 * * column 3, line 56 - column 4, line 35 *; | [DY]US4644582 (MORISHITA KOICHI [JP], et al) [DY] 3 * abstract * |