EP0832774 - Roof structure for convertible vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 17.07.2002 [2002/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klein, Berthold Schillerstrasse 55 71277 Rutesheim / DE | [1998/14] | Application number, filing date | 97116015.5 | 15.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | DE1996139567 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19639567 | [1998/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0832774 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0832774 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/18 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
B60J1/1823 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1998/51] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | ||
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Dachkonstruktion für einen offenen Personenkraftwagen | [1998/14] | English: | Roof structure for convertible vehicle | [1998/14] | French: | Structure de toit pour véhicule convertible | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 09.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/15] | 22.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 26.04.2000 | [2002/29] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2836457 (EUGENE BERMAN, et al) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]DE3416285 (HOETKER DIETER) [A] 1 * page 3, line 3 - line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US4784428 (MOY HOWARD [US], et al) [A] 1* column W *; | [A]GB2240519 (C & C INC [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |