EP0834444 - Motor vehicle with a body structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [1999/14] |
Former [1998/15] | For all designated states DAIMLER-BENZ AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baumann, Karl-Heinz Brühlstrasse 3 71149 Bondorf / DE | [1998/15] | Application number, filing date | 97116346.4 | 19.09.1997 | [1998/15] | Priority number, date | DE1996139565 | 26.09.1996 Original published format: DE 19639565 | [1998/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0834444 | Date: | 08.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0834444 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B62D31/00 | [1998/15] | CPC: |
B62D21/152 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1998/52] |
Former [1998/15] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Kraftfahrzeug mit einer Karosserietragstruktur | [1998/15] | English: | Motor vehicle with a body structure | [1998/15] | French: | Structure d'une carrosserie d'un véhicule à moteur | [1998/15] | Examination procedure | 27.02.1998 | Examination requested [1998/18] | 14.06.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.07.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3888502 (FELZER BERTOLD, et al) [Y] 1 * column 7, line 37 - line 50; figure 6 *; | [Y]DE4022137 (BATELLE-INSTITUT) [Y] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE4227967 (FUCHS FA OTTO [DE]); | [DA]DE4220438 (DOOSE VOLKER [DE]) |