EP0833493 - Method of and apparatus for reading image by flatbed scanning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dainippon Screen Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agura 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | For all designated states DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG. CO., LTD. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agura 4-chome Horikawa-dori Kamikyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Itano, Yoshiharu, c/o Dainippon Sc. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | 02 /
Kishida, Yoshihiro, Dainippon Sc. Mfg. Co., Ltd. 1-1, Tenjinkitamachi Teranouchi-agaru 4-chome Horikawa-dori, Kamikyo-ku, Kyoto / JP | [1998/14] | Representative(s) | Wilhelms Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | WILHELMS, KILIAN & PARTNER Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116552.7 | 23.09.1997 | [1998/14] | Priority number, date | JP19960252892 | 25.09.1996 Original published format: JP 25289296 | [1998/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0833493 | Date: | 01.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0833493 | Date: | 17.11.1999 | [1999/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/00, H04N1/191 | [1998/14] | CPC: |
H04N1/0405 (EP,US);
H04N1/0402 (EP,US);
H04N1/0411 (EP,US);
H04N1/0432 (EP,US);
H04N1/128 (EP,US);
H04N1/1911 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2000/30] |
Former [1998/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bildlesen unter Verwendung von Flachbettabtastung | [1998/14] | English: | Method of and apparatus for reading image by flatbed scanning | [1998/14] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la lecture d'image par moyen de balayage à champ plat | [1998/14] | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/27] | 21.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/15] | 08.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3104606 (GRUNDIG EMV [DE]) [A] 1,8 * page 19, lines 13-22; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]US5138478 (OGAWA HIDEAKI [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 1, lines 6-10; column 6, lines 10-41; column 7, lines 4-27; figures 5, 6 7A-7G *; | [A]US5132810 (KISHIDA YOSHIHIRO [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 6, lines 51-54; column 7, lines 23-28; column 8, lines 16-20; figures 1, 2, 5 *; | [A]US4580172 (RAJAGOPAL GANESH [US]) [A] 1,8 * abstract; column 1, line 25 to column 2, line 14; column 4, line 38 to column 5, line 31; figures 1 and 2 *; | [A]US4958236 (NAGASHIMA NAO [JP], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 5, line 48 to column 6, line 19; column 7, line 65 to column 8, line 13; figures 5 and 7 *; | [A]EP0717325 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG [JP]) [A] 1,8 * column 4, lines 3-10; figure 1A *; | [A]JPS5970360 ; | [A]JPH031752 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840814), vol. 008, no. 176, Database accession no. (E - 260), & JP59070360 A 19840420 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1,8 * English summary; figures 1-4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910314), vol. 015, no. 108, Database accession no. (E - 1045), & JP03001752 A 19910108 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * English summary; figures 1, 2, 7 * |