Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0833493
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.02.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] |
01.11.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.11.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.05.2004 |
First examination report |
|
18.05.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
10.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.10.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
09.06.2000 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 26.07.2000 [2000/30] |
19.05.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.07.2000 [2000/27] |
14.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
01.10.1999 |
Publication of search report |
published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] |
13.02.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.04.1998 [1998/14] |