EP0836364 - Hearing aid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ReSound-Viennatone Hörtechnologie AG Fröbelgasse 28 1160 Wien / AT | [1998/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ribic, Zlatan Anton Baumgartnerstrasse 44/A8/052 1230 Wien / AT | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Neugebauer, Jürgen, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | [2008/35] |
Former [2002/04] | Neugebauer, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys., et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | Fischer, Matthias, et al Schroeter Lehmann Fischer & Neugebauer Wolfratshauser Strasse 145 81479 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/16] | Fleuchaus, Leo, Dipl.-Ing., et al Melchiorstrasse 42 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97116809.1 | 26.09.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | AT19960001796 | 11.10.1996 Original published format: AT 179696 | [1998/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0836364 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0836364 | Date: | 19.03.2003 | [2003/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0836364 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H04R25/02 | [2006/15] | CPC: |
H04R25/456 (EP);
H04R25/65 (EP);
H04R2460/09 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/16] | H04R25/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IE, LI [2003/50] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hörhilfegerät | [1998/16] | English: | Hearing aid | [1998/16] | French: | Prothèse auditive | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 06.03.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   02.04.2001 | 30.09.2002 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2003 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.08.2006 | CH | 23.08.2006 | LI | 23.08.2006 | IE | 26.09.2006 | DK | 23.11.2006 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 23.08.2006 | |
CH | 23.08.2006 | ||
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/22] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
LI | 23.08.2006 | ||
DK | 23.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/17] | CH | 23.08.2006 | |
LI | 23.08.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0455203 (KNOWLES ELECTRONICS INC) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 3 * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 10 * * claims 1,2 *; | [A]US4629833 (KERN REINHARD ET AL) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 49 - column 2, line 47 * * claim 1 * |