EP0843994 - Composition and process for dyeing hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.2004 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wella Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | [1998/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Semadeni, Pascal André, Dr. Spielacker 1792 Cordast / CH | 02 /
Braun, Hans-Jürgen, Dr. Kapellacker 10 D 3182 Überstorf / CH | [1998/22] | Application number, filing date | 97117220.0 | 04.10.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | DE1996148020 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19648020 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843994 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843994 | Date: | 12.01.2000 | [2000/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843994 | Date: | 06.08.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/13 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
A61Q5/10 (EP);
A61K8/492 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/38] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mittel und Verfahren zum Färben keratinischer Fasern | [1998/22] | English: | Composition and process for dyeing hair | [1998/22] | French: | Composition et procédé pour colorer les cheveux | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/13] | 21.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 24.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 06.08.2003 | GB | 06.08.2003 | IT | 06.08.2003 | ES | 17.11.2003 | DE | 01.05.2004 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | FR | 06.08.2003 | |
GB | 06.08.2003 | ||
ES | 17.11.2003 | ||
DE | 01.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | GB | 06.08.2003 | |
ES | 17.11.2003 | ||
DE | 01.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/45] | GB | 06.08.2003 | |
DE | 01.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | DE | 01.05.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5364767 (FLOWERS DANIEL G [US], et al); | [A]JPH0538875 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930621), vol. 017, no. 324, Database accession no. (M - 1433), & JP05038875 A 19930219 (JUJO PAPER CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |