Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0838239 | Global Dossier | 27.03.2002 | B1 | EP0838239 | 18.08.1999 | A3 | EP0838239 | 29.04.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US72716296 | 07.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69711317D1 | 02.05.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US72716296 | 07.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW340483U | 11.09.1998 | U | Priority number | Date | US72716296 | 07.10.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5740698 | 21.04.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US72716296 | 07.10.1996 |