EP0835608 - Automatic apparatus for cutting and emulsification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Dornhan GmbH Postfach 11 23 72173 Dornhan / DE | [2001/46] |
Former [1998/16] | For all designated states Inofex Fleisch-, Lebensmitteltechnik und -technologie GmbH Martha-Brautzsch-Strasse 8 06108 Halle / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mössmer, Michael Steinhausstrasse 2 72291 Betzweiler-Wälde / DE | 02 /
Haack, Eberhard, Dr. Martha-Brautzsch-Strasse 8 06108 Halle / DE | [1998/16] | Representative(s) | Leinung, Günter, et al Patentanwalt Olvenstedter Strasse 15 39108 Magdeburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Leinung, Günter, et al Patentanwalt, Olvenstedter Strasse 15 39108 Magdeburg / DE | ||
Former [1998/16] | Leinung, Günter Patentanwalt, Olvenstedter Strasse 15 39108 Magdeburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97117303.4 | 07.10.1997 | [1998/16] | Priority number, date | DE1996142232 | 12.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19642232 | [1998/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0835608 | Date: | 15.04.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0835608 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A22C11/08, A22C11/00 | [1998/16] | CPC: |
A22C11/08 (EP,US);
A22C11/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/01] |
Former [1998/16] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Zerkleinerungs- und Emulgierautomat | [1998/16] | English: | Automatic apparatus for cutting and emulsification | [1998/16] | French: | Appareil automatique de coupe et d'émulsification | [1998/16] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/30] | 20.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR77757E (BENCKISER GMBH JOH A); | [A]DE1132464 (VEMAG VERDENER MASCH APP, et al); | [A]FR2335256 (VNII MYASNOI PROMY [SU]) [A] 1 * page 6, paragraph L - page 8, paragraph 2 *; | [A]DE3202588 (NOSS HELMUT); | [A]DE3542671 (KRAEMER & GREBE KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0247342 (SCHNELL MASCHFAB KARL [DE]); | [A]EP0491157 (FREY HEINRICH MASCHINENBAU [DE]); | [A]WO9629878 (VEMAG MASCHINENBAU GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1,4,10,11 * page 6, line 7 - page 8, paragraph 2 * |