EP0821257 - Portable communication display system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOPIN CORPORATION 695 Myles Standish Boulevard Myles Standish Industrial Park Taunton, MA 02780 / US | [1998/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fan, John C.C. 881 West Roxbury Parkway Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02167 / US | 02 /
Salerno, Jack P. 15 Larchmont avenue Waban, Massachusetts 02168 / US | 03 /
Gale, Ronald P. 1 Old Wolomolopoag Road Sharon, Massachusetts 02067 / US | 04 /
Jacobsen, Jeffrey 505 Tevis Trail Hollister, California 95023 / US | 05 /
Ronzani, Peter A. 16370 Matilija Drive Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 06 /
Pombo, Stephen 1270 G.Lawrence Station Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | [1998/18] |
Former [1998/05] | 01 /
Fan, John C.C. 881 West Roxbury Parkway Chestnut Hill Massachusetts 02167 / US | ||
02 /
Salerno, Jack P. 15 Larchmont avenue Waban, Massachusetts 02168 / US | |||
03 /
Gale, Ronald P. 1 Old Wolomolopoag Road Sharon, Massachusetts 02067 / US | |||
04 /
Jacobsen, Jeffrey 505 Tevis Trail Hollister, California 95023 / US | |||
05 /
Ronzani, Peter A. 16370 Matilija Drive Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | |||
06 /
Pombo, Stephen 1270 G. Lawrence Station Road Sunnyvale, California 94086 / US | Representative(s) | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co LLP St Botolph's House 7-9 St Botolph's Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/05] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 97117527.8 | 21.10.1994 | [1998/05] | Priority number, date | US19930141133 | 22.10.1993 Original published format: US 141133 | US19940220042 | 30.03.1994 Original published format: US 220042 | US19940287970 | 09.08.1994 Original published format: US 287970 | [1998/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0821257 | Date: | 28.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0821257 | Date: | 04.11.1998 | [1998/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/01 | [1998/45] | CPC: |
G02B27/0176 (EP);
G02B27/017 (EP);
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B2027/011 (EP);
G02B2027/0116 (EP);
G02B2027/0132 (EP);
G02B2027/0138 (EP);
G02B2027/0143 (EP);
G02B2027/0154 (EP);
G02B2027/0156 (EP);
G02B2027/0158 (EP);
G02B2027/0159 (EP);
G02B2027/0178 (EP);
G02B2027/0187 (EP);
G02B5/18 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1998/05] | G02B27/01, G06F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [1998/05] | Title | German: | Tragbares Anzeigesystem für die Telekommunikation | [1998/05] | English: | Portable communication display system | [1998/05] | French: | Système d'affichage portable pour les télécommunications | [1998/05] | Examination procedure | 28.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 20.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 30.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/45] | 05.06.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/45] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95900361.7 / EP0724743 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0539907 (SEGA) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * column 11, line 22 - line 24 * * figure - * [A] 5; | [X]EP0344881 (REFLECTION TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-10 * column 3, line 48 - line 58 * * column 8, line 54 - line 58 * * column 9, line 1 - line 2 * * figure - *; | [X]US4636866 (HATTORI NOBORU) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * column 4, line 46 - line 68 * * column 5, line 1 - line 2 * * figure - *; | [X]WO9216075 (DURAND LTD ;JOHNSON WILLIAM N H (GB)) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * page 6, paragraph 5 * * page 7, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * figure - *; | [X]US4933755 (DAHL THOMAS R ET AL) [X] 1-4,7-9,11-13 * column W *; | [A]EP0551781 (SONY) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4952024 (GALE) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0438362 (SONY) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0454443 (SONY) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US5106179 (KAMAYA ET AL) [A] 1-13 * column W *; | [A]US5034809 (KATOH) [A] 1-13 * column W *; | [A]GB2206421 (GEC-MARCONI) [A] 1,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0547493 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]US4361384 (BOSSERMAN) [A] 1-13 * column W *; | [DA]WO9318428 (KOPIN CORP) [DA] 1-13 * the whole document * |