EP0819547 - Thermal transfer image receiving sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo-to / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | For all designated states DAI NIPPON PRINTING CO., LTD. 1-1, Ichigaya-Kaga-Cho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ueno, Takeshi, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 02 /
Oshima, Katsuyuki, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 03 /
Asajima, Mikio, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 04 /
Yamauchi, Mineo, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 05 /
Imoto, Kazunobu, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 06 /
Takahara, Hidetake, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | 07 /
Ando, Jitsuhiko, DAI Nippon Printing Co., Ltd. 1-1, Ichigaya-kagacho 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo-to / JP | [1998/04] | Representative(s) | Smart, Peter John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/04] | Smart, Peter John W.H. BECK, GREENER & CO 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn London WC2A 3SZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 97117547.6 | 27.05.1992 | [1998/04] | Priority number, date | JP19910149294 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14929491 | JP19910149295 | 27.05.1991 Original published format: JP 14929591 | JP19910150910 | 28.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15091091 | JP19910153804 | 30.05.1991 Original published format: JP 15380491 | JP19910185798 | 01.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18579891 | JP19910206208 | 24.07.1991 Original published format: JP 20620891 | JP19910211438 | 30.07.1991 Original published format: JP 21143891 | [1998/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0819547 | Date: | 21.01.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0819547 | Date: | 24.11.1999 | [1999/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/00 | [1998/04] | CPC: |
B41M5/42 (EP,US);
B41J2/325 (EP);
B41M5/40 (EP,US);
B41M5/41 (EP,US);
B41M5/52 (EP,US);
B41M2205/02 (EP,US);
B41M2205/32 (EP,US);
B41M2205/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/423 (EP,US);
B41M5/426 (EP,US);
B41M5/44 (EP,US);
B41M5/46 (EP,US);
B41M5/5218 (EP,US);
B41M5/5227 (EP,US);
B41M5/5245 (EP,US);
B41M5/5254 (EP,US);
B41M5/5272 (EP,US);
B41M5/529 (EP,US);
B41M7/0027 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1051 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24934 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249953 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31993 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1998/04] | Title | German: | Bildempfangsschicht für thermische Farbstoffübertragung | [1998/04] | English: | Thermal transfer image receiving sheet | [1998/04] | French: | Support récepteur de l'image par transfert thermique | [1998/04] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 02.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 10.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/37] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP92304759.1 / EP0516370 | Divisional application(s) | EP03004492.9 / EP1316435 | EP05013905.4 / EP1582372 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH01135692 ; | [X]US4547788 (KURISU NORIO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 6, line 33 - column 10, line 52 *; | [X]US4609928 (KUBO KEISHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 6, line 28 - line 35 *; | [X]JPS62299392 ; | [X]JPS63264395 ; | [X]JPH01229683 ; | [X]US4538164 (TAKIGAWA NOBUHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * column 5, line 21 - line 38 *; | [X]JPS5787989 ; | [A]JPH01301371 ; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890825), vol. 013, no. 385, Database accession no. (M - 864), & JP01135692 A 19890529 (KANZAKI PAPER MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880603), vol. 012, no. 190, Database accession no. (M - 704), & JP62299392 A 19871226 (RICOH CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890210), vol. 013, no. 060, Database accession no. (M - 796), & JP63264395 A 19881101 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891211), vol. 013, no. 555, Database accession no. (M - 904), & JP01229683 A 19890913 (CANON INC) [X] 1-4 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820917), vol. 006, no. 181, Database accession no. (M - 156), & JP57087989 A 19820601 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900220), vol. 014, no. 091, Database accession no. (M - 0938), & JP01301371 A 19891205 (TSUNEO IWASAKI) [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - W. JANSSENS ET AL., "THERMAL DYE TRANSFER", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, (19901201), no. 320, page COMPLEET, XP000163321 [A] 1 |