EP0844029 - Method and device for identifying mail [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.01.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.2003 [2003/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lohmann, Boris, Dr. Höhrenbergstrasse 10 78476 Allensbach / DE | [1998/22] | Application number, filing date | 97117714.2 | 13.10.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | DE1996144249 | 24.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19644249 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844029 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844029 | Date: | 27.01.1999 | [1999/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844029 | Date: | 27.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B07C3/14 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B07C3/00 (EP);
B07C3/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [1999/40] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Identifizierung von Sendungen | [1998/22] | English: | Method and device for identifying mail | [1998/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'identification de courrier | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/22] | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 19.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.11.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4000603 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-5 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3239938 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3301494 (PIETZSCH LUDWIG [DE]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3942932 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [A] 3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US4832204 (HANDY STEVEN W [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * abstract * |