blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0837115

EP0837115 - Method for cutting wafers from a crystal [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1998/17]Slicing slurry and method for cutting wafers from a crystal
[1999/11]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.11.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip03.11.2000No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.12.2000 [2000/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wacker Siltronic Gesellschaft für Halbleitermaterialien Aktiengesellschaft
Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24
84489 Burghausen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]For all designated states
Wacker Siltronic Gesellschaft für Halbleitermaterialien Aktiengesellschaft
Johannes-Hess-Strasse 24
84489 Burghausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Knepprath, Vernon
20090 SE Fairway
Damascus, Oregon / US
02 / Frank, Walter
Watzmannring 25
84508 Burgkirchen
Alz / DE
03 / Kaeser, Maximilian
Botzenstrasse 12
84561 Mehring-Öd / DE
04 / Pemwieser, Albert
Mitterndorf 14
5122 Ach / AT
[1998/17]
Representative(s)Rimböck, Karl-Heinz, et al
Wacker-Chemie GmbH
Zentralabteilung PML
Hanns-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/17]Rimböck, Karl-Heinz, Dr., et al
c/o Wacker-Chemie GmbH Zentralabteilung PML Hans-Seidel-Platz 4
81737 München / DE
Application number, filing date97117891.816.10.1997
[1998/17]
Priority number, dateDE199614290817.10.1996         Original published format: DE 19642908
[1998/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0837115
Date:22.04.1998
Language:DE
[1998/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0837115
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.01.1998
ClassificationIPC:C09K3/14
[1998/17]
CPC:
B28D1/025 (EP,US); H01L21/78 (KR); C09K3/1472 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [1999/01]
Former [1998/17]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zum Abtrennen von Scheiben von einem Kristall[1999/11]
English:Method for cutting wafers from a crystal[1999/11]
French:Procédé pour couper des plaquettes d'un cristal[1999/11]
Former [1998/17]Sägesuspension und Verfahren zum Abtrennen von Scheiben von einem Kristall
Former [1998/17]Slicing slurry and method for cutting wafers from a crystal
Former [1998/17]Suspension de sciage et procédé pour couper des plaquettes d'un cristal
Examination procedure16.10.1997Examination requested  [1998/17]
16.10.1997Request for accelerated examination filed
01.04.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.04.1998Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
03.09.1998Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.1998Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.1999Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.03.1999Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.07.1999Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.09.1999Fee for grant paid
16.09.1999Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.10.2000No opposition filed within time limit [2000/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH04218594  ;
 [A]JPS5721495  ;
 [XA]US2980524  (MORTON JOHN S) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-5;
 [XA]US3817727  (YANCEY P) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [A] 3-5;
 [DA]EP0686684  (BAYER AG [DE]) [DA] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0733429  (WACKER SILTRONIC HALBLEITERMAT [DE]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *;
 [DA]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 38, Database accession no. 92-312572, XP002050861 & JPH04218594 A 19920810 (NIPPON STEEL CORP) [DA] 1-5 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19820527), vol. 006, no. 090, Database accession no. (C - 104), & JP57021495 A 19820204 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP) [A] 1-5 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.