11.01.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] |
29.10.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.12.2004 [2004/51] |
02.04.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.05.2004 [2004/21] |
25.07.2003 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] |
02.08.2002 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
21.06.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
03.04.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.03.2002 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
11.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
26.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.09.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.05.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
08.03.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
01.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.09.2000 |
First examination report |
|
26.09.2000 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.10.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.04.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
05.03.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.04.1999 [1999/16] |
19.06.1998 |
Publication of search report |
published on 05.08.1998 [1998/32] |
03.04.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] |
03.04.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.05.1998 [1998/21] |