Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH10157902 | Global Dossier | 16.06.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US74988996 | 18.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0842884 | Global Dossier | 18.09.2002 | B1 | EP0842884 | 05.08.1998 | A3 | EP0842884 | 20.05.1998 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US74988996 | 18.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59708250D1 | 24.10.2002 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US74988996 | 18.11.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5730435 | 24.03.1998 | A | Priority number | Date | US74988996 | 18.11.1996 |