EP0838691 - Method and apparatus for recognition and compensation of GPS antenna lever arm in integrated GPS/DEAD reckoning navigation systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.07.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.2005 [2005/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1998/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geier, George Jeffrey 11364, E. Appaloosa Place Scottsdale, Arizona 85259 / US | [1998/18] | Representative(s) | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus Patents Limited Grove House Lutyens Close Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/49] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Optimus, Grove House, Lutyens Close, Chineham Court Basingstoke, Hampshire RG24 8AG / GB | ||
Former [2003/25] | McCormack, Derek James, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property Section, Law Department, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | ||
Former [1998/18] | Gibson, Sarah Jane, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 97118165.6 | 20.10.1997 | [1998/18] | Priority number, date | US19960739010 | 28.10.1996 Original published format: US 739010 | [1998/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0838691 | Date: | 29.04.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0838691 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | [1999/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0838691 | Date: | 25.08.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/02, G01C21/20 | [1999/26] | CPC: |
G01S3/023 (EP,US);
G01S19/49 (EP,US);
G01S19/52 (EP,US);
G01S5/017 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/18] | G01S3/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [2000/11] |
Former [1998/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Erkennung und Kompensation des GPS Antennenhebelarms in einem integrierten GPS/Koppelnavigationssystem | [1998/18] | English: | Method and apparatus for recognition and compensation of GPS antenna lever arm in integrated GPS/DEAD reckoning navigation systems | [1998/18] | French: | Méthode et dispositif pour la reconnaissance et la compensation du bras de levier d'un antenne GPS d'un système intégré de navigation à l'estime et à GPS | [1998/18] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 12.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/33] | Request for further processing for: | 17.04.2003 | Request for further processing filed | 17.04.2003 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.2003 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]EP0567268 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [Y] 1,3,4,6 * abstract * * column 3, line 46 - column 5, line 6 * * column 11, line 7 - column 13, line 9 * [A] 2,7-9; | [AD]US5416712 (GEIER GEORGE J [US], et al) [AD] 1,6 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 20 ** column 15, line 56 - column 16, line 25 *; | [A]US5543804 (BUCHLER ROBERT J [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column 1, line 54 - column 2, line 22 * * column 6, line 26 - line 58 *; | [YA] - PHAM T M, "Kalman filter mechanization for INS airstart", IEEE AEROSPACE AND ELECTRONICS SYSTEMS MAGAZINE, JAN. 1992, USA, ISSN 0885-8985, vol. 7, no. 1, pages 3 - 11, XP002101778 [Y] 1,3,4,6 * page 7, column L, paragraph 4 - page 8, column L, paragraph 1 * [A] 8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/62.127124 |