EP0841506 - Hydrostatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.06.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.07.2003 [2003/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SMS Demag AG Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [2000/21] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Eduard-Schloemann-Strasse 4 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hild, Berthold Trifftstrasse 50 57299 Burbach / DE | 02 /
Stötzel, Helmut Am Rauhen Berg 9 57271 Hilchenbach / DE | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Valentin, Ekkehard, et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich, Valentin, Gihske, Grosse, Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Valentin, Ekkehard, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwälte Hemmerich-Müller-Grosse- Pollmeier-Valentin-Gihske Hammerstrasse 2 57072 Siegen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118207.6 | 21.10.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | DE1996145699 | 06.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19645699 | [1998/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0841506 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0841506 | Date: | 05.07.2000 | [2000/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841506 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/40 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
F16H61/478 (EP,US);
F15B13/02 (KR);
F15B21/001 (KR);
F15B21/08 (KR);
F15B21/14 (EP,US);
F16H61/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2001/11] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hydrostatisches Getriebe | [1998/20] | English: | Hydrostatic transmission | [1998/20] | French: | Transmission hydrostatique | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/20] | 05.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5519904 ; | [A]US4528813 (IZUMI EIKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,3 * column A; figure 1 *; | [A]US5211015 (SCHROEDER KLAUS [DE]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 1 * * column 5, line 27 - line 46 *; | [A]DE4422424 (SCHLOEMANN SIEMAG AG [DE]) [A] 1* the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800419), vol. 004, no. 053, Database accession no. (M - 008), & JP55019904 A 19800213 (SUMITOMO HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |