EP0844119 - Mobile home, camper or suchlike [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 08.12.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2000 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.01.2001 [2001/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Knaus GmbH Jandelsbrunn Helmut-Knaus-Strasse 1 94118 Jandelsbrunn / DE | [1998/52] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states Knaus Caravan GmbH Helmut-Knaus-Strasse 1 94118 Jandelsbrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cürten, Franz J. Biberacher Strasse 114 89079 Ulm / DE | 02 /
Nusser, Alois Adalbert-Stifter-Str. 12 94118 Jandelsbrunn / DE | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Matschkur, Lindner, Blaumeier Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Matschkur, Lindner Blaumeier Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Dr.-Kurt-Schumacher-Strasse 23 90402 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118310.8 | 22.10.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | DE1996220321U | 22.11.1996 Original published format: DE 29620321 U | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844119 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844119 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/20 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B60J1/2077 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1998/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wohnmobil, Motorhome od.dgl. | [1998/22] | English: | Mobile home, camper or suchlike | [1998/22] | French: | Autocaravane, camping-car ou similaire | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2000 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19741863 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [E] 1,4 * column 4, line 17 - line 65; figure - *; | [X]US5044686 (ACENBRACK DONALD F [US]) [X] 1 * column 5, line 67 - column 6, line 35; figure 7 *; | [A]US4758042 (LIU CHI-NAN [TW]) [A] 1-4 * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 29; figure - *; | [X]DE4431110 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 5; figure - *; | [A]DE4426789 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 10 - line 61; figure - * |