EP0841280 - Safety gear [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.11.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kone Corporation Munkkiniemen Puistotie 25 00330 Helsinki / FI | [1998/25] |
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states KONE OY Munkkiniemen puistotie 25 00330 Helsinki / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aulanko, Esko Käenkatu 6 C 33 04320 Kerava / FI | 02 /
Lempiö, Ilkka Aittapellonkatu 9 A 25 15170 Lahti / FI | 03 /
Tyllinen, Juha Usvatie 3 A 2 12400 Tervakoski / FI | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Graf Glück Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Zipse Habersack Kritzenberger Patentanwälte Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/20] | Zipse & Habersack Wotanstrasse 64 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97118920.4 | 30.10.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | FI19960004484 | 07.11.1996 Original published format: FI 964484 | FI19960004903 | 05.12.1996 Original published format: FI 964903 | [1998/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841280 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0841280 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/18, F16D59/00, B66D5/00 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
B66B5/18 (EP,US);
B66B5/22 (EP,KR,US);
F16D63/008 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2127/007 (EP,KR,US);
F16D2127/10 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1999/04] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung | [1998/20] | English: | Safety gear | [1998/20] | French: | Mécanisme de sécurité | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 27.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/26] | 19.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO8502169 (COBIANCHI LIFTTEILE AG [CH]) [A] 1 * page 2, line 16 - page 3, line 34; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0490090 (INVENTIO AG [CH]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 15 - line 42; figure 2 *; | [A]US1581458 (LINDQUIST DAVID L) [A] 1 * page 2, line 83 - line 119; figures 3,4 * |