EP0841224 - Airbag module. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA (EUROPE) VEHICLE SAFETY TECHNOLOGY GmbH Helmholtzstrasse 22, Science Park D-89081 Ulm / DE | [1998/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klingauf, Gerhard Bei der Kirche 7 88481 Balzheim / DE | 02 /
Mitzkus, Jürgen Fuchsweg 37 89275 Elchingen / DE | [1998/20] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Christian, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/20] | Schmidt, Christian, et al Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Robert-Koch-Strasse 1 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119452.7 | 06.11.1997 | [1998/20] | Priority number, date | DE1996146204 | 08.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19646204 | [1998/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0841224 | Date: | 13.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1998/20] | CPC: |
B60R21/217 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1999/04] |
Former [1998/20] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Airbag-Anordnung | [1998/20] | English: | Airbag module. | [1998/20] | French: | Module de coussin gonflable. | [1998/20] | Examination procedure | 18.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/42] | 14.11.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, ES, FI, FR, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 04.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/35] | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/35] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 11.12.1998 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 11.12.1998 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2270042 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3,5,6,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 4,7,11; | [Y]GB2250483 (TAKATA CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * figure 6; claims 1,2,5 *; | [PY]DE29704195U (KOLB ANDREAS [DE]) [PY] 7,11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE4425495 |