EP0843957 - Combined rotary harrow and seed drill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.06.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lemken GmbH & Co. KG Weseler Strasse 5 46519 Alpen / DE | [1998/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Siebers, Joseph Dorsewald 14 46509 Xanten / DE | 02 /
Gebbeken, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Alte Strasse 67 b 46519 Alpen / DE | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Schulte, Jörg Schulte & Schulte Patentanwälte Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Schulte, Jörg, Dipl.-Ing. Hauptstrasse 2 45219 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119517.7 | 07.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | DE1996146992 | 14.11.1996 Original published format: DE 19646992 | DE1997148064 | 31.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19748064 | [1998/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0843957 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843957 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | A01B73/04, A01B49/06 | [1998/22] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, NL [1999/06] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bestellkombination aus Kreiselegge und Drillmaschine | [1998/22] | English: | Combined rotary harrow and seed drill | [1998/22] | French: | Combinaison de herse rotative et semoir | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 09.05.1998 | Examination requested [1998/28] | 14.02.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.02.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.2000 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2002/18] | FR | 28.12.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2312931 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [A] 1* figure - *; | [Y]EP0333109 (MASCHIO SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *; | [Y]EP0422721 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [A]DE9213091U (RABEWERK) [A] 1 * figure - * |