EP0843495 - Method and system for the monitoring of the radio environment in a dect cordless system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.05.2006 [2006/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Italtel S.p.a. Via Alessio di Tocqueville, 13 20154 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states Italtel s.p.a. Via Alessio de Tocqueville, 13 20154 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states Italtel s.p.a. Piazzale Zavattari, 12 20149 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marnoni, Luca Via per Ceriano, 17 21047 Saronno (VA) / IT | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Giustini, Delio Siemens Information and Communication Networks S.p.A. Via Monfalcone 1 Palazzo Gorky 20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Giustini, Delio Siemens Information and Communication Networks S.p.A. Palazzo Gorky Via Monfalcone, 1 20092 Cinisello Balsamo / IT | ||
Former [1998/21] | Giustini, Delio c/o Italtel S.p.A., Cascina Castelletto 20019 Settimo Milanese (MI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 97119629.0 | 10.11.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI02412 | 19.11.1996 Original published format: IT MI962412 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843495 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843495 | Date: | 18.08.1999 | [1999/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/26, H04Q7/30, H04B7/26, H04Q7/38, H04Q7/36 | [1999/33] | CPC: |
H04W16/10 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1998/21] | H04Q7/26, H04Q7/30, H04B7/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2000/17] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Einrichtung zur Überwachung der Funkumgebung in einem DECT System | [1998/21] | English: | Method and system for the monitoring of the radio environment in a dect cordless system | [1998/21] | French: | Méthode et système pour la surveillance de l'environnement radio dans un système DECT | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Examination requested [2000/01] | 26.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/18] | 28.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2005 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0467600 (NORTHERN TELECOM LTD [CA]) [A] 1,10* column 4, line 6 - column 5, line 25 *; | [A]US5212831 (CHUANG JUSTIN C [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * column 11, line 34 - column 14, line 9 *; | [A]US5241691 (OWEN FRANK C G [GB]) [A] 1,10 * column 4, line 51 - column 7, line 13 *; | [A]WO9627267 (MOTOROLA INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * page 7, line 6 - page 12, line 22 * * page 13, line 31 - page 15, line 6 *; | [A]WO9633560 (ITALTEL SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1,10 * column W * |