blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0841522

EP0841522 - Accumulator with insertable heat generator [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.02.2001
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 24.09.2008  [2008/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOLVIS Solarsysteme GmbH
Marienberger Strasse 1
38122 Braunschweig / DE
[1998/20]
Inventor(s)01 / Krause, Thomas, Dipl.-Ing.
Hohnrodts Hof 3
38802 Wolfenbüttel / DE
02 / Jäger, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Bührigshof 3
38533 Vordorf / DE
03 / Terschüren, Klaus-Henning, Dipl.-Ing.
Hauptstrasse 3
38173 Evessen / DE
04 / Lange, Heinrich
Mühleweg 11a
58730 Fröndenberg / DE
[1998/20]
Representative(s)Einsel, Martin
Patentanwälte Einsel & Kollegen Jasperallee 1a
38102 Braunschweig / DE
[2008/39]
Former [1998/20]Einsel, Martin, Dipl.-Phys.
Patentanwalt, Jasperalle 1A
38102 Braunschweig / DE
Application number, filing date97119675.311.11.1997
[1998/20]
Priority number, dateDE199614629411.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19646294
[1998/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0841522
Date:13.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/20]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0841522
Date:12.01.2000
[2000/02]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:F24H1/20, F24H9/18
[1998/20]
CPC:
F24H1/206 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Former [1998/20]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Speicher mit Wärmeerzeugereinschub[1998/20]
English:Accumulator with insertable heat generator[1998/20]
French:Accumulateur avec générateur de chaleur insérable[1998/20]
Examination procedure13.07.2000Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/14]
09.11.2000Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2001/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
01.09.2000M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200004   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0387139  (LACAZE JULIEN SA [FR]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *;
 [X]US4465024  (ADAMS CHARLES L [US]) [X] 1,2 * column A *;
 [A]US4301772  (EISING JOHN P) [A] 1,14 * column A *
by applicantDE4211153
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.