blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0842910

EP0842910 - Binder based on waterglass solution, process for its preparation and its utilisation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.08.2002
Database last updated on 26.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bayerisches Zentrum für Angewandte Energieforschung e.V. ZAE Bayern
Am Hubland
97074 Würzburg / DE
[1998/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Korder, Saschan
Sonnenbuck 7
91607 Gebsattel / DE
02 / Arduini-Schuster, Mariacarla
Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 3
97273 Kürnach / DE
03 / Kuhn, Joachim Dr.
Wölffelstrasse 4
97072 Würzburg / DE
04 / Tappert, Wolfgang
Zweierweg 6a
97074 Würzburg / DE
05 / Fricke, Jochen, Prof. Dr.
Paul-Ehrlich-Strasse 32
97218 Gerbrunn / DE
[1998/21]
Representative(s)Götz, Georg Alois, et al
Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Postfach 35 45
90017 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Götz, Georg Alois, et al
Intellectual Property IP-GÖTZ Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 35 45
90017 Nürnberg / DE
Former [1998/21]Götz, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Götz, Küchler, Dameron Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 11 93 40
90103 Nürnberg / DE
Application number, filing date97119708.211.11.1997
[1998/21]
Priority number, dateDE199614711114.11.1996         Original published format: DE 19647111
[1998/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0842910
Date:20.05.1998
Language:DE
[1998/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0842910
Date:16.12.1998
[1998/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.11.1998
ClassificationIPC:C04B12/04
[1998/21]
CPC:
C04B28/26 (EP); C04B12/04 (EP); C09D1/02 (EP);
C04B2111/00482 (EP); Y02W30/91 (EP)
C-Set:
C04B28/26, C04B14/062, C04B14/064, C04B40/0082 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/062, C04B18/26, C04B40/0082 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/062, C04B20/002, C04B40/0082 (EP);
C04B28/26, C04B14/062, C04B24/24, C04B40/0082 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1999/34]
Former [1998/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Bindemittel auf der Basis von Wasserglaslösung, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung sowie dessen Verwendung[1998/21]
English:Binder based on waterglass solution, process for its preparation and its utilisation[1998/21]
French:Liant à base d'une solution de verre soluble, procédé pour sa préparation et son utilisation[1998/21]
Examination procedure11.06.1999Examination requested  [1999/32]
17.06.1999Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
13.01.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
27.01.2000Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE
22.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
22.05.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
31.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.09.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.01.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2002/38]
08.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2002/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
02.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.07.1999BE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999DK   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999FI   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999GR   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999IE   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999LU   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999MC   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999NL   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999PT   M01   Not yet paid
19.07.1999SE   M01   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]US4078029  (YOSHIDA AKITOSHI, et al) [X] 1,9 * column 3 *;
 [X]GB2123711  (CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD) [X] 1,8,13,15 * ganzes Dokument *;
 [A]EP0206717  (NISSAN CHEMICAL IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,13-15* page 5 - page 12; claims 1-9 *;
 [X]EP0295834  (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [X] 1 * page 4; examples 5-42 *;
 [X]US5396749  (FUKUSHIMA TAKUO [JP]) [X] 1,11 * column 2 - column 3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.