EP0847887 - Multi-channel heating or air conditioning unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. KG Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2004/51] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Behr GmbH & Co. Mauserstrasse 3 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baruschke, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Rechbergweg 5 73117 Wangen / DE | 02 /
Lochmahr, Karl Mohnweg 5 71665 Vaihingen / DE | 03 /
Schweizer, Gebhard, Dipl.-Ing. Arndtstrasse 4 71229 Leonberg / DE | 04 /
Speer, Markus Im Gallenmichel 1 74343 Sachsenheim / DE | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2002/43] |
Former [2001/34] | Patentanwälte Ruff, Wilhelm, Beier, Dauster & Partner Postfach 10 40 36 70035 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [1998/25] | Wilhelm & Dauster Patentanwälte European Patent Attorneys Hospitalstrasse 8 70174 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97119772.8 | 12.11.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | DE1996151222 | 10.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651222 | [1998/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0847887 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0847887 | Date: | 11.12.2002 | [2002/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0847887 | Date: | 31.08.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/00 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
B60H1/00842 (EP);
B60H1/00864 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/42] |
Former [2003/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, LI | ||
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Mehrkanalige Heiz- oder Klimaanlage | [1998/25] | English: | Multi-channel heating or air conditioning unit | [1998/25] | French: | Dispositif de chauffage ou de climatisation à canaux multiples | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2003 | Examination requested [2003/16] | 01.04.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 29.07.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT | 22.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.11.2004 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.09.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.09.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.12.1999 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.1999 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE19527739 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1,2,3 * column 3, line 40 - column 5, line 15; figures 1,2 * * column 10, line 51 - column 11, line 47; figures 1-5 * * figure 1 * [A] 4,5; | [X]JPS5932511 ; | [X]DE4425697 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) [X] 1,3 * page 8, line 2 - line 24; figure 1 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840614), vol. 008, no. 128, Database accession no. (M - 302), & JP59032511 A 19840222 (NISSAN JIDOSHA KK) [X] 1,3 * abstract * | by applicant | US4482009 | EP0214605 | EP0568444 |