EP0844112 - A method and apparatus for detecting the presence of an at least partially deflated tyre on a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.2003 [2003/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | [2002/30] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states FIAT AUTO S.p.A. Corso Giovanni Agnelli 200 10135 Torino / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Randazzo, Cristina Via Viglione 8 14022 Castelnuovo Don Bosco (Asti) / IT | 02 /
Re Fiorentin, Stefano Corso Adriatico 347/4/E 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | 03 /
Cascio, Fulvio Via Cortassa 11 10044 Pianezza (Torino) / IT | [2001/47] |
Former [1998/22] | 01 /
Randazzo, Cristina Via Viglione 8 14022 Castelnuovo Don Bosco (Asti) / IT | ||
02 /
Re Fiorentin, Stefano Corso Adriatico 347/4/E 10095 Grugliasco (Torino) / IT | |||
03 /
Cascio, Fulvio Via Cartassa 11 10044 Pianezza (Torino) / IT | Representative(s) | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Quinterno, Giuseppe, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Corso Regio Parco, 27 10152 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 97119982.3 | 14.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00938 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: IT TO960938 | [1998/22] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844112 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844112 | Date: | 04.09.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | B60C23/06 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
B60C23/061 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1999/13] |
Former [1999/06] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, LI | ||
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Ausrüstung zum Erkennen eines Reifens mit zumindest teilweisem Druckverlust an einem Kraftfahtzeug. | [2002/31] | English: | A method and apparatus for detecting the presence of an at least partially deflated tyre on a motor vehicle | [1998/22] | French: | Procédé et équipement pour détecter un pneumatique au moins partiellement dégonflé sur un véhicule automobile | [1998/22] |
Former [1998/22] | Verfahren und Ausrüstung zum Erkennen eines Reifens mit zumindest teilweisen Druckverlust an einem Kraftfahrzeug | Examination procedure | 13.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/05] | 28.11.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.1999 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT | 06.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.03.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.02.1999 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.02.1999 | PT   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS58188704 ; | [A]EP0552827 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 6 * * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 12 * * column 11, line 54 - column 12, line 12; figure - *; | [A]GB2270167 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 4 * page 6, line 10 - page 9, line 8; figure - *; | [A]EP0656268 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1 * page 14, line 26 - page 15, line 4; figure 13 *; | [A]EP0712740 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP], et al) [A] 5* page 3, line 24 - line 44; figure 4 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840210), vol. 008, no. 032, Database accession no. (M - 275), & JP58188704 A 19831104 (SHIN NIPPON DENKI KK) [A] 1 * abstract * |