blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0843376

EP0843376 - Constitution of protrusible external and fixed internal antenna for radio portable remote terminal device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  07.04.2006
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NEC Corporation
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8001 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/21]For all designated states
NEC CORPORATION
7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Matai, Masahiro
NEC Shizuoka, Ltd., 4-2, Shimomata
Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka / JP
[1998/21]
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/35]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
Former [1998/21]VOSSIUS & PARTNER
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date97120000.114.11.1997
[1998/21]
Priority number, dateJP1996030615018.11.1996         Original published format: JP 30615096
[1998/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0843376
Date:20.05.1998
Language:EN
[1998/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0843376
Date:23.02.2000
[2000/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.2000
ClassificationIPC:H01Q1/08, H01Q1/24
[1998/21]
CPC:
H01Q1/243 (EP,US); H01Q1/244 (EP,US); H01Q1/245 (EP,US);
H01Q1/521 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/44]
Former [1998/21]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  DK,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  IE,  IT,  LI,  LU,  MC,  NL,  PT,  SE 
TitleGerman:Ausbildung von ausfahrbarer externer und fester interner Antenne für ein tragbares Funkendgerät[1998/21]
English:Constitution of protrusible external and fixed internal antenna for radio portable remote terminal device[1998/21]
French:Constitution d'une antenne externe rétractable et d'une antenne intérieure fixée pour un terminal éloigné de radio portable[1998/21]
Examination procedure28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
22.04.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2005Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/21]
16.12.2005Date of oral proceedings
22.12.2005Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
23.12.2005Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
29.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200509   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US4633519  (GOTOH AKIO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, lines 42-46,55-60 ** column 3, lines 2,15,16; figures 1,3; claim 1 *;
 [Y]US4829591  (HASHIMOTO KAZUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,6 * column 1, lines 22-25,41-44 * * column 3, lines 1-8,54-56 * * column 4, lines 8-10; figures 1A,1B; claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US4914714  (TAMURA YOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 3, lines 26-32,44-49.54-57; figures 2A,2B *;
 [A]US4958382  (IMANISHI YASUHITO [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 1, lines 9,10,17-21,35-42 * * column 2, lines 51-58 * * column 4, lines 1-12,37; figures 1-4 *;
 [Y]EP0648023  (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO [JP]) [Y] 1,2,6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 13-18,24-30 * * column 4, lines 30-44 * * column 7, lines 9-16; figures 3,8,9 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.