EP0842991 - Primer composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI TAKEDA CHEMICALS, INC. 2-5, Kasumigaseki, 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Mitsui Takeda Chemicals, Inc. 2-5, Kasumigaseki, 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1998/21] | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tominaga, Yukio, c/o Takeda Chemical Ind. Ltd. 17-85, Juso-honmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | 02 /
Tsuchida, Atsuko, c/o Takeda Chemical Ind. Ltd. 17-85, Juso-honmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | 03 /
Shiraki, Hiroyuki, c/o Takeda Chemical Ind. Ltd. 17-85, Juso-honmachi 2-chome, Yodogawa-ku Osaka / JP | [1998/21] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/21] | Barz, Peter, Dr. Patentanwalt Kaiserplatz 2 80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120111.6 | 17.11.1997 | [1998/21] | Priority number, date | JP19960306639 | 18.11.1996 Original published format: JP 30663996 | [1998/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0842991 | Date: | 20.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0842991 | Date: | 23.05.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/00, C08G18/28, C08G18/79, C08G18/80, C08G18/63 | [1998/21] | CPC: |
C08G18/6229 (EP,US);
C08G18/706 (EP,US);
C08G18/809 (EP,US);
C09D5/002 (EP,US);
Y10S525/902 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, SE [1999/05] |
Former [1998/21] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GRUNDIERZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [1998/21] | English: | Primer composition | [1998/21] | French: | COMPOSITION D'APPRET | [1998/21] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1998 | Examination requested [1998/44] | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 23.05.2001 | SE | 23.08.2001 | DK | 17.11.2001 | [2008/07] |
Former [2003/46] | SE | 23.08.2001 | |
DK | 17.11.2001 | ||
Former [2002/05] | SE | 23.08.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3779794 (DE SANTIS G) [A] 1,4,6 * column 6, line 16 - line 43; example 2 *; | [DA]JPH036274 ; | [A]EP0238013 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * claims 1,2 *; | [A]EP0520390 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [A] 1,3,4 * page 6, line 47 - line 54; claims 1,3 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910326), vol. 015, no. 123, Database accession no. (C - 0816), & JP03006274 A 19910111 (SUNSTAR ENG INC) [DA] 1,4,6 * abstract * |