EP0848128 - Door check for motor vehicle doors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.09.2002 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.10.2002 [2002/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ED. Scharwächter GmbH Hohenhagener Strasse 26-28 42855 Remscheid / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states ED. Scharwächter GmbH Hohenhagener-Strasse 26-28 42809 Remscheid / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klüting, Bernd-Alfred Jung-Stillung-Weg 18 42477 Radevormwald / DE | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Sparing, Rolf Klaus Bonnekamp & Sparing Patentanwaltskanzlei European Patent & Trade Mark Law Firm Goltsteinstrasse 19 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/26] | Sparing, Rolf Klaus c/o Patentanwaltskanzlei Dr.-Ing. Horst Bonnekamp Bankstrasse 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1999/23] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1998/25] | Schön, Theodor, Patent- und Zivilingenieur Sonnleiten 7 84164 Moosthenning / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120228.8 | 19.11.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | DE1996221382U | 10.12.1996 Original published format: DE 29621382 U | [1998/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0848128 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0848128 | Date: | 28.06.2000 | [2000/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/10, B60J5/04 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
E05D11/1085 (EP,US);
E05D2011/1035 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/531 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [2001/10] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Türfeststeller für Kraftwagentüren | [1998/25] | English: | Door check for motor vehicle doors | [1998/25] | French: | Arrêt de porte pour véhicules automobiles | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 19.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/25] | 18.11.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.09.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4426425 (BEHM ERNST DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1* column 1; figure - *; | [A]DE4428965 (BEHM ERNST [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1 - column 2; figure - *; | [A]DE29614385U (SCHARWAECHTER GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * claim 1 * |