EP0846617 - Surface device provided for a wall in contact with a flowing fluid being turbulent in the main fluid flow direction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V 53127 Bonn / DE | [1999/12] |
Former [1998/24] | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Luft- und Raumfahrt e.V. 53127 Bonn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bechert, Dietrich W., Dr. Goethestrasse 69 10625 Berlin / DE | [1998/24] | Representative(s) | REHBERG HÜPPE + PARTNER Patentanwälte PartG mbB Robert-Gernhardt-Platz 1 37073 Göttingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Rehberg Hüppe + Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 31 62 37021 Göttingen / DE | ||
Former [1998/24] | Patentanwälte Rehberg + Hüppe Am Kirschberge 22 37085 Göttingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120247.8 | 19.11.1997 | [1998/24] | Priority number, date | DE1996150439 | 05.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19650439 | [1998/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0846617 | Date: | 10.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0846617 | Date: | 29.12.1999 | [1999/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0846617 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B64C21/10 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
F15D1/12 (EP,US);
B62D35/00 (EP,US);
B64C21/10 (EP,US);
B64C2230/26 (EP,US);
Y02T50/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2000/36] |
Former [1998/24] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Oberfläche für eine von einer eine Strömungshauptrichtung aufweisenden Strömung turbulent umströmten Wand | [1998/24] | English: | Surface device provided for a wall in contact with a flowing fluid being turbulent in the main fluid flow direction | [1998/24] | French: | Elément de surface disposé sur une paroi parcourue par un fluide présentant un écoulement turbulent dans la direction principale d'écoulement. | [1998/24] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/10] | 30.06.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | 08.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 27.07.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 27.07.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]EP0205289 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DX] 1,4 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 12; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3534293 (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM [DE]) [A] 1 * column 3, line 3 - line 4 *; | [A]EP0411351 (DESCENTE LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 7, line 27 - line 37; figure 6 *; | [A]US4706910 (WALSH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 19 - line 36 *; | [DA] - M. BRUSE, D.W. BECHERT, J.G.T. VAN DER HOEVEN, W. HAGE, G. HOPPE, "Experiments with conventional and withnovel adjustable drag-reducing surfaces", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NEAR-WALL TURBULENT FLOWS, Tempe,Arizona,USA, (19930315), pages 719 - 738, XP002118583 [DA] 1 * page 722 * | by applicant | EP0205289 | - D.W. BECHERT, G. HOPPE, J.G.T. VAN DER HOEVEN, R. MAKRIS, THE BERLIN OIL CHANNEL FOR DRAG REDUCTION RESEARCH, EXP. IN FLUIDS 12, (1992), pages 251 - 260 |