EP0844270 - Water absorbing agent and method of producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 11-1, Ichinohashinomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 11-1, Ichinohashinomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 605-0995 / JP | ||
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states SANYO CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 11-1, Ichinohashinomoto-cho, Higashiyama-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto-fu, 605 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Inoue, Shigeo, Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 12-10, Yasu-cho Ohata, Yasu-gun Shiga-ken, 520-23 / JP | 02 /
Takeda, Shigeaki, Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 16-6-704, Honkatata 4-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga-ken, 520-02 / JP | 03 /
Nagasaki, Osamu, Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 49-3, Ritto-cho Kohirai Kurita-gun, Shiga-ken, 520-30 / JP | 04 /
Date, Masashi, Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 7-5-1402, Obana 2-chome Kawanishi-shi, Hyogo-ken, 666 / JP | 05 /
Tanaka, Kenji, Sanyo Chemical Industries, Ltd. 21-17, Seta 5-chome Otsu-shi, Shiga-ken, 520-21 / JP | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/22] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120269.2 | 19.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | JP19960326033 | 20.11.1996 Original published format: JP 32603396 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0844270 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0844270 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08J3/122 (EP);
C08J2300/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/06] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Wasserabsorbierendes Mittel und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1998/22] | English: | Water absorbing agent and method of producing the same | [1998/22] | French: | Agent absorbant l'eau et son procédé de préparation | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 23.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/03] | 28.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 17.11.2004 | IT | 17.11.2004 | SE | 17.11.2004 | ES | 28.02.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2007/17] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
SE | 17.11.2004 | ||
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/27] | FI | 17.11.2004 | |
ES | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 17.11.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5064582 (SUTTON TOD A ET AL) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 10-54; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5122544 (BAILEY KRISTY M ET AL) [A] 2,5,7 * column 2, line 19 - column 3, line 12 *; | [A]EP0450922 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND) [A] 1 * column 4, line 13 - column 6, line 17 * |