EP0848213 - Oven for the heat treatment of food [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.11.2001 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2002 [2002/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wiesheu GmbH Daimlerstrasse 10 71563 Affalterbach / DE | [1998/29] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Wiesheu-Wiwa GmbH Daimlerstrasse 10 D-71563 Affalterbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braun, Martin Kirchheimer Strasse 87 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 02 /
Mohr, Johann Allensteiner Weg 14 74078 Heilbronn / DE | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Gahlert, Stefan, et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil Patentanwälte Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Gahlert, Stefan, Dr.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller, Gahlert, Otten & Steil, Patentanwälte, Rotebühlstrasse 121 70178 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120333.6 | 20.11.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | DE1996151225 | 10.12.1996 Original published format: DE 19651225 | [1998/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848213 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F24C15/02 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
F24C15/026 (EP);
F24C15/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Ofen zur Wärmebehandlung Von Lebensmitteln | [1998/25] | English: | Oven for the heat treatment of food | [1998/25] | French: | Four pour le traîtement thermique d'aliments | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 11.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/01] | 05.02.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/01] | 19.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2002/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]FR2699219 (SOREMAM) [X] 1-3,8 * page 6, line 16 - line 31; figures 2,3 * [A] 9,10; | [X]DE29610178U (WILLNER ROLAND ;HEMMERLING SABINE DIPL ING (DE)) [X] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0706012 (CONVOTHERM ELEKTROGERAETE) [X] 1,3,9 * abstract *; | [X]GB2280829 (LONDON INST HIGHER EDUCATION C ;GOLD JONATHAN MORRIS (GB)) [X] 1,2,4 * page 16, line 1 - line 3; figures 3,6 *; | [A]US4030475 (TRONSTAD KNUT) [A] 1-3 * abstract * |