EP0862047 - Device for levelling a measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.12.2003 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayer & Wonisch GmbH & Co. KG Donnerfeld 2 59757 Arnsberg / DE | [1998/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wonisch, Martin Donnerfeld 2A 59757 Arnsberg / DE | [1998/36] | Representative(s) | Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Söltenfuss Zweibrückenstrasse 6 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/49] | Söltenfuss, Dirk Christian, Dipl.-Phys., et al OCKEL.SÖLTENFUSS, Patentanwaltssozietät, Morassistrasse 8/II 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120424.3 | 21.11.1997 | [1998/36] | Priority number, date | DE1997203672U | 28.02.1997 Original published format: DE 29703672 U | [1998/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0862047 | Date: | 02.09.1998 | Language: | DE | [1998/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0862047 | Date: | 13.10.1999 | [1999/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0862047 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/26 | [1998/36] | CPC: |
G01C9/28 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [2000/26] |
Former [1998/36] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Nivellieren einer Messeinrichtung | [1998/36] | English: | Device for levelling a measuring device | [1998/36] | French: | Dispositif pour niveler un appareil de mesure | [1998/36] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1999 | Examination requested [1999/52] | 14.04.2000 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 25.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 30.10.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 10.05.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 10.05.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.01.2003 | IT | 29.01.2003 | NL | 29.01.2003 | DK | 29.04.2003 | ES | 30.07.2003 | [2008/07] |
Former [2004/22] | GB | 29.01.2003 | |
NL | 29.01.2003 | ||
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/04] | NL | 29.01.2003 | |
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
ES | 30.07.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | NL | 29.01.2003 | |
DK | 29.04.2003 | ||
Former [2003/41] | NL | 29.01.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2207410 (O'KEEFE JOSEPH F) [X] 1,6,7 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [A]US4150492 (TRACY ALAN C [US]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [Y]GB2276451 (INTUITIVE DESIGNS LIMITED [GB]) [Y] 2 * abstract * |