blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0849637

EP0849637 - Illumination apparatus and exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  31.03.2000
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip31.03.2000Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 17.05.2000 [2000/20]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building
2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100-0005 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]For all designated states
NIKON CORPORATION
Fuji Building, 2-3 Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku
Tokyo 100 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Tanitsu, Osamu c/o Nikon Corporation
Fuji Building, 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome
Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo / JP
[1998/26]
Representative(s)Füchsle, Klaus, et al
Hoffmann - Eitle
ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR / DE
[N/P]
Former [1998/26]Füchsle, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Hoffmann Eitle, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date97120462.321.11.1997
[1998/26]
Priority number, dateJP1996032758522.11.1996         Original published format: JP 32758596
[1998/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0849637
Date:24.06.1998
Language:EN
[1998/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0849637
Date:05.01.2000
[2000/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.11.1999
ClassificationIPC:G03F7/20
[1998/26]
CPC:
G03F7/70058 (EP,US); H01L21/027 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [1998/26]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
LTNot yet paid
LVNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RONot yet paid
SINot yet paid
TitleGerman:Beleuchtungsvorrichtung und Belichtungsvorrichtung[1998/26]
English:Illumination apparatus and exposure apparatus[1998/26]
French:Dispositif d'illumination et dispositif d'exposition[1998/26]
Examination procedure24.03.2000Application withdrawn by applicant  [2000/20]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.11.1999Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DA]JPH08293461  (NIKON CORP) [DA] 1,8,11,14;
 US5731577  [ ] (TANITSU OSAMU [JP]) [ ] * column 1, line 6 - line 15 * * column 4, line 55 - column 6, line 34 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0564264  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8,11,14 * column 16, line 8 - line 32 * * figure 22 *;
 [A]EP0526242  (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,8,11,14 * column 16, line 7 - line 21 * * figure 4 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.