EP0844655 - An integrated circuit chip packaging method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated P.O. Box 655474 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, TX 75265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED P.O. Box 655474, 13500 Central Expressway Dallas, TX 75265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zuniga, Edward R. 2804 Mimosa Sherman, TX 75092 / US | 02 /
Helmick, Mary E. 817 Simon Plano, TX 75025 / US | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Degwert, Hartmut, et al Prinz & Partner GbR Rundfunkplatz 2 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2003/12] | Degwert, Hartmut, Dipl.-Phys., et al Prinz & Partner GbR, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | ||
Former [1998/22] | Schwepfinger, Karl-Heinz, Dipl.-Ing. Prinz & Partner, Manzingerweg 7 81241 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120464.9 | 21.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | US19960031776P | 22.11.1996 Original published format: US 31776 P | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844655 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844655 | Date: | 15.12.1999 | [1999/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/56 | [1998/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/56 (EP);
H01L23/50 (KR);
H01L2224/32245 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2224/48465 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00012 (EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/34] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verpackungsmethode für integrierten Schaltungschip | [1998/22] | English: | An integrated circuit chip packaging method | [1998/22] | French: | Procédé d'empaquetage pour puces à circuits intégrés | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 13.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/32] | 04.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 03.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5106784 (BEDNARZ GEORGE A [US]) [A] 1-16 * figure 6 *; | [A]JPS5835946 ; | [PA]US5622731 (FIERKENS RICHARD H J [NL]) [PA] 1-16 * figure 1 *; | [A]JPS59145534 ; | [A]US4003125 (WALLICK CHARLES W) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0654444 ; | [A]US4132856 (HUTCHISON ROBERT V, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4173821 (MAKINO KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]US4592131 (DEIE TOSHIKAZU [JP]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0114474 (WESTERN ELECTRIC CO [US]) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]JPS58204543 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830519), vol. 007, no. 115, Database accession no. (E - 176), & JP58035946 A 19830302 (FUJITSU KK) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19841218), vol. 008, no. 277, Database accession no. (E - 285), & JP59145534 A 19840821 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO KK) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940531), vol. 018, no. 286, Database accession no. (E - 1556), & JP06054444 A 19940225 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-16 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840306), vol. 008, no. 049, Database accession no. (E - 230), & JP58204543 A 19831129 (KAZUO BANDOU) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |