EP0849220 - Process for producing aerogel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 13.02.2008 [2008/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sonoda, Kenji 23-442, Kiyotakinakamachi Shijonawate-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Yokogawa, Hiroshi 45-2-604, Sakuragaokacho Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Yokoyama, Masaru 1-1-15, Nishiyamamotocho Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Tsubaki, Kenji 1-2-508, Amanogaharacho Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | [2005/09] |
Former [1998/26] | 01 /
Sonoda, Kenji 23-442, Kiyotakinakamachi Shijonawate-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Yokogawa, Hiroshi 45-2-604, Sakuragaokacho Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Yokohama, Masaru 1-1-15, Nishiyamamotocho Yao-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Tsubaki, Kenji 1-2-508, Amanogaharacho Katano-shi, Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte, von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 (Deichmannhaus) 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120526.5 | 22.11.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | JP19960342176 | 20.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34217696 | JP19960343282 | 24.12.1996 Original published format: JP 34328296 | JP19970061435 | 14.03.1997 Original published format: JP 6143597 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849220 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849220 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/158 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
C01B33/1585 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Aerogels | [1998/26] | English: | Process for producing aerogel | [1998/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation d'un aérogel | [1998/26] | Examination procedure | 22.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/43] | 15.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.01.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 16.03.2005 | LI | 16.03.2005 | NL | 16.03.2005 | SE | 16.06.2005 | [2008/07] |
Former [2006/14] | CH | 16.03.2005 | |
LI | 16.03.2005 | ||
NL | 16.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | CH | 16.03.2005 | |
LI | 16.03.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB721605 (CA NAT RESEARCH COUNCIL) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]EP0396076 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 2 * claims 1,7 * * page 2, line 1 - line 14 * * page 3, line 33 - line 36 * * page 4, line 5 - line 7 * * example 3 * [A] 1; | [D]JPH02304299 (BASF AG); | [Y]EP0409083 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | JPH05279011 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD,); | [A]EP0585456 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 2-5 * claims 14-17 * * page 4, line 36 - page 5, line 24 * * example 1 *; | [A]WO9506617 (BASF AG [DE], et al); | [A]EP0690023 (HOECHST AG [DE]); | [YA]WO9622942 (HOECHST AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1 * claims 1-13 * * page 9, line 3 - line 10 * * examples 1,2 * [A] 3,6; | [PX]EP0779523 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2 * abstract * * page 5, line 4 - line 8 *; | [A] - YOKOGAWA HIROSHI AND AL., "Manufacture of hydrophobic porous transparent aerogel", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19940321), vol. 120, no. 12, Database accession no. 136092, XP002058806 [A] 1 * abstract * | [A] - H. YOKOGAWA ET AL., "Hydrophobic aerogels", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS., AMSTERDAM NL, (1995), vol. 186, pages 23 - 29, XP002058805 [A] 1 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(95)00086-0 |