03.08.2018 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] |
08.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] |
27.11.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
05.09.2008 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.10.2008 [2008/41] |
16.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2008 [2008/25] |
02.05.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2008 [2008/23] |
28.09.2007 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] |
26.09.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.09.2007 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
31.05.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.12.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.06.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
28.04.2006 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
03.03.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 19.04.2006 [2006/16] |
20.01.2006 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
20.01.2006 |
Change - representative |
published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] |
24.12.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.12.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.12.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.10.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.06.2004 |
First examination report |
|
01.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.10.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 10.12.2003 [2003/50] |
07.02.2003 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.03.2003 [2003/13] |
04.12.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
14.11.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.11.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
25.02.1999 |
Change - extension states |
|
08.01.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.02.1999 [1999/08] |
11.12.1998 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.01.1999 [1999/04] |
17.04.1998 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.06.1998 [1998/23] |