EP0845691 - Optical cable with tubular metal core [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.09.2008 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2018 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES | published on 05.09.2018 [2018/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Prysmian Cavi e Sistemi Energia S.r.l. Viale Sarca 222 20126 Milano / IT | [2006/10] |
Former [2003/50] | For all designated states Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Via Gaetano Negri 10 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2003/13] | For all designated states PIRELLI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/23] | For all designated states PIRELLI CAVI E SISTEMI S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Consonni, Enrico Via Luini, 66 Seregno (Milano) / IT | [1998/23] | Representative(s) | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Pirelli 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/16] | Marchi, Massimo, et al Marchi & Partners S.r.l., Via Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2006/10] | Checcacci, Giorgio, et al Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia, 20 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1998/23] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni, et al Pirelli S.p.A. Direzione Proprietà Industriale Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 97120571.1 | 24.11.1997 | [1998/23] | Priority number, date | IT1996MI02494 | 29.11.1996 Original published format: IT MI962494 | [1998/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0845691 | Date: | 03.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0845691 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [1998/23] | CPC: |
H04B10/50 (EP,US);
H04B1/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1999/08] |
Former [1998/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Optisches Kabel mit rohrenförmiger metallischer Seele | [1998/23] | English: | Optical cable with tubular metal core | [1998/23] | French: | Câble optique avec une ame tubulaire métallique | [1998/23] | Examination procedure | 27.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/04] | 04.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 31.10.2007 | SE | 31.01.2008 | [2018/36] |
Former [2018/28] | ES | 31.10.2007 | |
NL | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 31.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | NL | 31.10.2007 | |
SE | 31.01.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2029047 (KOKUSAI DENSHIN DENWA CO LTD); | [AD]US4239336 (PARFREE COLIN S [GB], et al); | [AD]EP0023154 (PIRELLI GENERAL PLC [GB]); | [AD]US4371234 (PARFREE COLIN S [GB], et al); | [AD]GB2176905 (STC PLC); | [A]EP0313896 (KABELMETAL ELECTRO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1,15-17 * figure -; claim - *; | [AX]US5143274 (LAUPRETRE JEAN-JACQUES [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,9,11,21 * figure -; claim - * [X] 18; | [AD]GB2253717 (ASS ELECT IND [GB]); | [A]US5238172 (LE DAVAY LOUIS [FR]) [A] 1,37 * figure -; claim - *; | [AD]US5263239 (ZIEMEK GERHARD [DE]); | [A]EP0727274 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP0727679 (NIPPON KOKAN KK [JP]) [A] 1,2,7,8,18,21,22,37 * figure -; claim - * |