EP0844584 - Pointing device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.08.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 01.10.2003 [2003/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 West Boulevard North Elkhart Indiana 46514-1899 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states CTS Corporation 905 North West Boulevard Elkhart Indiana 46514-1899 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seffernick Lewis L. 8304 N 000 Road Decatur, AdamsIN 46733 / US | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Feldkamp, Rainer, et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | Feldkamp, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing., et al Garmischer Strasse 4 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120626.3 | 25.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | US19960756202 | 25.11.1996 Original published format: US 756202 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0844584 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0844584 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2002 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/18, G05G9/047 | [2002/27] | CPC: |
G06F3/0338 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20201 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | G06K11/18 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/13] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Hinweisanordnung | [1998/22] | English: | Pointing device | [1998/22] | French: | Dispositif de pointage | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/40] | 29.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.02.2003 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0151479 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 2,5,8-10; | [Y]EP0681261 (IBM [US]) [Y] 2,5,8-10 * column 3, line 17 - column 7, line 35 * * figures 1-6 *; | [DY]US5473347 (COLLAS JAMES P [US], et al) [DY] 8-10 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 50 * * figures 1-4 *; | [DA]EP0685817 (IBM [US]) [DA] 1-3 * abstract * * page 3, line 24 - line 29 * * figure 3 *; | US5489900 [ ] (CALI MATTHEW F [US], et al); | [Y]WO9611434 (INTERLINK ELECTRONICS INC [US]) [Y] 8 * page 4, line 23 - page 5, line 19 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-5 * | by applicant | US4680577 | US4876524 | US4905523 | US4967605 | US4969366 | US5263375 | US5325081 | US5407285 | USRE35016E | US5473347 | US5489900 | US5521596 |