EP0843986 - Device for non-invasive determination of glucose concentration in blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.2005 [2005/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1998/22] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS, LTD. 1048, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Maruo, Katsuhiko 1-19-1-814, Higashi-Arioka Itami-shi, Hyogo 664 / JP | 02 /
Shimizu, Keisuke B-105, 7-19, Nakakido-cho Neyagawa-shi, Osaka 572 / JP | 03 /
Oka, Masami 1-3-22-302, Miyakojima-Minamidori, Miyakojima-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 534 / JP | [1998/22] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [1998/22] | Application number, filing date | 97120653.7 | 25.11.1997 | [1998/22] | Priority number, date | JP19960314379 | 26.11.1996 Original published format: JP 31437996 | JP19970169267 | 25.06.1997 Original published format: JP 16926797 | JP19970271709 | 03.10.1997 Original published format: JP 27170997 | [1998/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0843986 | Date: | 27.05.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0843986 | Date: | 29.09.1999 | [1999/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0843986 | Date: | 24.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, G01N21/35, G01N21/31 | [1999/39] | CPC: |
A61B5/1455 (EP,US);
A61B5/00 (KR);
A61B5/14532 (EP,US);
A61B5/6843 (EP,US);
G01N21/359 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2562/0242 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1998/22] | A61B5/00, G01N21/35 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/24] |
Former [1998/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur non-invasiven Bestimmung der Glukosekonzentration im Blut | [1998/22] | English: | Device for non-invasive determination of glucose concentration in blood | [1998/22] | French: | Dispositif de détermination non invasive de la concentration de glucose dans le sang | [1998/22] | Examination procedure | 01.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/04] | 26.06.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9118548 (CLIFT VAUGHAN [DK]) [A] 1-20* page 11, line 15 - page 12, line 20; claim 1 *; | [A]WO9410901 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * page 12, line 1 - line 15 *; | [A]US5370114 (WONG JACOB Y [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 4 - column 6; figures 4,6B *; | [A]WO9510223 (INOMET INC [US]) [A] 1-20 * page 9, line 15 - page 10, line 15; figures 1,2 * |