EP0854631 - An image reading apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/30] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | ||
Former [1999/09] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu 545 / JP | ||
Former [1998/30] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagano, Fumikazu 46-13, Izumihara-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara / JP | 02 /
Yasuhara, Mitsugi 2-43, Daikan-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara / JP | 03 /
Tanaka, Akihiro 2234-5-3, Koizumi-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara / JP | [1998/30] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/30] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 97120845.9 | 27.11.1997 | [1998/30] | Priority number, date | JP19970007232 | 20.01.1997 Original published format: JP 723297 | [2000/22] |
Former [1998/30] | JP19970009232 | 20.01.1997 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0854631 | Date: | 22.07.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0854631 | Date: | 01.03.2000 | [2000/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0854631 | Date: | 23.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/047, H04N1/32 | [1998/30] | CPC: |
H04N1/32448 (EP,US);
H04N1/0473 (EP,US);
H04N1/32358 (EP,US);
H04N1/12 (EP,US);
H04N1/193 (EP,US);
H04N2201/02439 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/45] |
Former [1998/30] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Bildlesegerät | [1998/30] | English: | An image reading apparatus | [1998/30] | French: | Dispositif de lecture d'image | [1998/30] | Examination procedure | 23.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 21.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.02.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4748514 (BELL GREGORY E [US]) [X] 1-10 * column A * * claims 1-5 *; | [X]US4160279 (FUWA JYOICHI) [X] 1-10 * column A * * claims 1-11 *; | [X]US5508820 (KABEYA SHOZO [JP]) [X] 1-10 * column A * * claim 1 *; | [A]US5517331 (MURAI YUKAKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * column A *; | [A]US4712139 (KATO YOSHIAKI [JP]) [A] 1-10 * column A * |