Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0919362
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
15.11.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
22.07.2002 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
|
20.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
21.01.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
03.01.2002 |
Surcharge for renewal fee |
|
14.09.2001 |
First examination report |
|
11.09.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
15.06.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
07.12.2000 |
Renewal fee |
|
24.07.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
17.04.2000 |
Loss of particular rights |
|
24.02.2000 |
Change - extension states |
|
10.02.2000 |
Period of grace (R.85a/R.108(3) EPC1973) |
|
30.12.1999 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.02.2000 [2000/07] |
11.12.1999 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] |
07.12.1999 |
Renewal fee |
|
16.04.1999 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.06.1999 [1999/22] |