EP0927799 - Cemetery Monument [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rodrigues, Robert Wallace 325 West Maple Avenue Bound Brook, NJ 08805 / US | [1999/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1999/27] | Representative(s) | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow, G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1999/27] | Sarup, David Alexander, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook, Raworth House, 36 Sydenham Road Croydon, Surrey CRO 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 97121207.1 | 03.12.1997 | [1999/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0927799 | Date: | 07.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E04H13/00 | [1999/27] | CPC: |
E04H13/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2000/11] |
Former [1999/27] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Grabmal | [1999/27] | English: | Cemetery Monument | [1999/27] | French: | Monument funéraire | [1999/27] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1998 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Priority | 18.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 01 | 08.01.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/46] | 14.06.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2000/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 16.03.2000 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 16.03.2000 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 16.03.2000 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1999 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2584443 (T. VERDOUX) [X] 1,2,5,7 * the whole document *; | [A]US5517791 (H. J. WEISS) [A] 1-3,8 * column 6, line 58 - column 7, line 48; figures 26-42,50-55 *; | [Y]DE3621971 (K. EVELT) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [Y]CH688101 (J. SCHNEIDER) [Y] 1,2,5,6 * the whole document *; | [X]US5363609 (J. P. HANCOVSKY) [X] 9 * column W *; | [A]GB405131 (M. BRESCIANI) [A] 9 * the whole document *; | [A]GB358025 (H. P. EDWARD) [A] 2,8 * the whole document *; | [AD]US5687515 (R. W. RODRIGUES ET AL) [AD] 3,4 * column W * |