EP0849558 - Metallic fin for a heat exchanger [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1998/26] | Improved metallic fin for heat exchanger, more particularly for automotive vehicles. | ||
[2002/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.02.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.04.2004 [2004/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR 8, rue Louis-Lormand, La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bouzida, Samy 23, rue Maître Albert 75005 Paris / FR | 02 /
Powers, Mike V. 1034 Southwestern Drive Lake Wood, NY 14750 / US | 03 /
Mignot, Christophe 7, rue de la Touche 78160 Le Perray En Yvelines / FR | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Valeo Systèmes Thermiques 8 Rue Louis Lormand BP 517 - La Verrière 78321 Le Mesnil Saint-Denis Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2003/02] | Rolland, Jean-Christophe Valeo Thérmique Moteur, Propriété Industrielle, 8, rue Louis-Lormand 78321 La Verrière / FR | ||
Former [2001/03] | Plaçais, Jean-Yves, et al Cabinet Netter, 40, rue Vignon 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1998/26] | Gamonal, Didier, et al Valeo Management Services, Propriété Industrielle, 2, rue André Boulle - B.P. 150 94017 Créteil / FR | Application number, filing date | 97121211.3 | 03.12.1997 | [1998/26] | Priority number, date | FR19960015584 | 18.12.1996 Original published format: FR 9615584 | [1998/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0849558 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0849558 | Date: | 16.04.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1998 | Classification | IPC: | F28F1/12, F28F1/32 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
F28F1/325 (EP,US);
F28F1/128 (EP,US);
F28F2215/04 (EP,US);
Y10S165/487 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1999/10] |
Former [1998/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Metallische Rippe für einen Wärmetauscher | [2002/33] | English: | Metallic fin for a heat exchanger | [2002/33] | French: | Aillette métallique pour un échangeur de chaleur | [2002/33] |
Former [1998/26] | Verbesserte, metallische Rippe für Wärmetauscher, insbesondere für ein Kraftfahrzeug | ||
Former [1998/26] | Improved metallic fin for heat exchanger, more particularly for automotive vehicles. | ||
Former [1998/26] | Aillette métallique perfectionnée pour échangeur de chaleur, notamment pour véhicule automobile | Examination procedure | 16.11.1998 | Examination requested [1999/02] | 01.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 16.07.2003 | [2003/41] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3250325 (RHODES EUGENE E, et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US5035052 (SUZUKI YOSHIO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | Examination | US5289874 | by applicant | US5289874 |