EP0848023 - Low surface energy polyisocyanates and their use in one- or two-component coating compositions [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.2004 [2004/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER CORPORATION 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | For all designated states Bayer Corporation 100 Bayer Road Pittsburgh, PA 15205-9741 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yeske, Philip E. Wolfskaul 7 51061 Köln / DE | 02 /
Slack, William E. RR 5, Box 327 Moundsville, WV 2604 / US | 03 /
Squiller, Edward P. 100 Christopher Circle Pittsburgh, PA 15205 / US | [1998/25] | Representative(s) | Steiling, Lothar Bayer AG BAG-LP-IPM Gebäude Q 18 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/25] | Steiling, Lothar, Dr. Bayer AG Konzernbereich RP Patente und Lizenzen 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Application number, filing date | 97121224.6 | 03.12.1997 | [1998/25] | Priority number, date | US19960764891 | 16.12.1996 Original published format: US 764891 | [1998/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848023 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0848023 | Date: | 27.08.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/28, C08G18/50, C08G18/78, C08G18/80 | [1998/25] | CPC: |
C08G18/8087 (EP,US);
C08G18/773 (EP,US);
C08G18/7837 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1999/09] |
Former [1998/25] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Polyisocyanate mit niedriger Oberflächenenergie und ihre Verwendung für Ein- oder Zweikomponenten-Beschichtungszusammensetzungen | [1998/25] | English: | Low surface energy polyisocyanates and their use in one- or two-component coating compositions | [1998/25] | French: | Polyisocyanates à faible énergie de surface et leur utilisation pour des compositions de revêtement à un ou à deux composants | [1998/25] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 06.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0719809 (BAYER AG [US]) [DA] 1-3,5,11,13,15,17 * page 2, line 7 - page 6, line 44 * * examples 1-13,28 *; | [A]EP0692566 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-3,5 * page 2, line 34 - page 4, line 51 * * page 7, line 54 - page 8, line 12 *; | [A]US3746689 (LAKSHMI T, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 1, line 31 - column 2, line 71 * * example 1 * * claims 1,2,4 *; | [A]US4606737 (STERN RICHARD M [US]) [A] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 16 - column 13, line 23 * * examples 1,4-6,13; tables 5,7 * |